Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
House conferees appointed: Pressly, Gregory Miller, and Wright.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: McMath, Robert Mills, and Harris.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Reported with amendments (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|