LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2020 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR22
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR22
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2020 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR22
Action History
House
05/18/2020
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
House
05/15/2020
Received in the House from the Senate.
Senate
05/15/2020
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
Senate
05/14/2020
Reported favorably.
Senate
05/04/2020
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Senate
03/16/2020
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.