Louisiana 2020 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR45 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            2020 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 45
BY SENATORS CORTEZ, ABRAHAM, ALLAIN, BARROW, BERNARD,
BOUDREAUX, BOUIE, CARTER, CATHEY, CLOUD, CONNICK,
FESI, FIELDS, FOIL, HARRIS, HENRY, HENSGENS, HEWITT,
JACKSON, JOHNS, LAMBERT, LUNEAU, MCMATH, MILLIGAN,
FRED MILLS, ROBERT MILLS, MIZELL, MORRIS, PEACOCK,
PETERSON, POPE, PRICE, REESE, SMITH, TALBOT, TARVER,
WARD, WHITE AND WOMACK 
A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
To commend Ed Orgeron, head coach of the Louisiana State University Fighting Tigers
football team on an undefeated 2019-2020 season, leading the Tigers to a national
championship, and being the recipient of numerous coaching awards and accolades.
WHEREAS, Edward James Orgeron Jr.,"Coach O", as he is fondly referred to, was
born to Edward "Ba Ba" Orgeron Sr. and Cornelia "Co Co" Orgeron, and grew up with his
brother, Steve, in Larose, Louisiana; and
WHEREAS, of Cajun descent, he attended South Lafourche High School in Galliano,
Louisiana, where he played on the Class 4A state championship team in 1977; and
WHEREAS, Coach O signed to play football at Louisiana State University, but left
the program after his first year and transferred to Northwestern State University in
Natchitoches, Louisiana; and
WHEREAS, Coach O began coaching in 1984 as a graduate assistant at
Northwestern State University and the following year, coached at McNeese State University
in Lake Charles, Louisiana; and
WHEREAS, he then served two years as an assistant strength coach at the University
of Arkansas, and in 1988, began his tenure with the University of Miami as the defensive
line coach as the Hurricanes garnered a national championship in 1989; and
WHEREAS, in 1992, Coach O took a respite from coaching and in 1994, returned
as a volunteer linebacker coach at Nicholls State University in Thibodaux, Louisiana; and
WHEREAS, the following year, he moved from the south to the northeastern United
States, accepting a job at Syracuse University with Head Coach Paul Pasqualoni, whom he
credits with developing his coaching skills on and off the field, and where he coached the
defensive line for three years; and 
WHEREAS, in 1998, Coach O was hired by the University of Southern California
Page 1 of 3 SCR NO. 45	ENROLLED
to coach the Trojans' defensive line, took on the added responsibility of recruiting
coordinator in 2001, and was named assistant head coach in 2003 as the Trojans won a
national championship along with LSU; and
WHEREAS, in 2004, he was hired as the head coach at the University of Mississippi
(Ole Miss), and in January, 2008, became the defensive line coach for the New Orleans
Saints; and
WHEREAS, on December 31, 2008, Coach O accepted a position with the University
of Tennessee as associate head coach, recruiting coordinator, and defensive line coach; and
WHEREAS, he returned to USC's assistant coaching staff in 2010, and in 2013,
became the interim head coach of the Trojans for the remainder of the season, posting a 6-2
record; and
WHEREAS, on January 14, 2015, Coach O was hired as the defensive line coach at
LSU, and on September 25, 2016, after head coach Les Miles was terminated following a
loss to Auburn, he was named the interim head coach; and
WHEREAS, under his guidance, LSU finished out the season with a 6–2 record, and
on November 26, 2016, LSU removed the "interim" tag from Coach O's title and formally
named him as its thirty-second full-time head coach; and
WHEREAS, under the leadership of Coach O, the Tigers finished the 2017 season
with a record of 9-4; and
WHEREAS, with a 9-3 record in 2018, the Tigers were invited to the Fiesta Bowl
and finished the season 10-3, were ranked sixth in the nation by the AP Poll and seventh by
the Coaches Poll, and earned Coach O a contract extension through the 2022 season; and
WHEREAS, after opening with a home win versus Georgia Southern University to
begin the 2019 season, the Tigers recorded a statement road win over the University of
Texas in week two and proceeded to go undefeated through the regular season, including a
46-41 victory over the University of Alabama at Bryant-Denny Stadium in Tuscaloosa; and
WHEREAS, a win over the University of Arkansas Razorbacks in the penultimate
game of the regular season clinched the SEC West division title and secured a berth in the
2019 SEC Championship Game against the University of Georgia Bulldogs, the Tigers' first
appearance and win since 2011, posting a 37-10 score; and
Page 2 of 3 SCR NO. 45	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, on December 8, 2019, the Tigers were named the number one seed in
the College Football Playoffs, met the University of Oklahoma Sooners in the semifinals in
the Peach Bowl, and defeated them by a score of 63-28; and
WHEREAS, on January 13th, 2020, Coach O won his first national championship
as a head coach with a win over the Clemson Tigers by a score of 42-25 in the
Mercedes-Benz Superdome in New Orleans, completing a perfect season; and
WHEREAS, under the leadership and inspiration of Coach O, the Tigers set team,
league, conference, and national records while posting a 15-0 record, defeating seven top ten
teams, validating recognition that the 2019 Tigers were the best collegiate football team
ever; and
WHEREAS, Coach O received the AFCA Coach of the Year Award, the Eddie
Robinson Coach of the Year Award, the Walter Camp Coach of the Year Award, and the
Paul "Bear" Bryant Coach of the Year Award, and was named AP Coach of the Year, Home
Depot Coach of the Year, and SEC Coach of the Year; and
WHEREAS, Ed Orgeron, one of Louisiana's finest sons, merits a special measure of
commendation for his achievements as the head coach of the LSU Tigers during the
2019-2020 season and for being an ambassador for the great state of Louisiana as he
proclaims "Geaux Tigers".
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
commend and congratulate Ed Orgeron, head coach of the Louisiana State University
Fighting Tigers football team, on an undefeated 2019-2020 season, leading the Tigers to a
national championship, and being the recipient of numerous coaching awards and accolades,
and does hereby record for posterity the pride and honor that he brings to his family, friends,
the faculty and students at Louisiana State University, the state of Louisiana, and the United
States of America.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to
Ed Orgeron.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Page 3 of 3