Senate | 05/18/2020 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2020. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2020 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/07/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/07/2020 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2020 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2020 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2020 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |