Senate | 06/01/2020 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. | ||
House | 06/01/2020 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2020 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2020 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/29/2020 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 100 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/27/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2020 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2020 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |