Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 102 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2020
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|