Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2020
|
Reported favorably (13-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|