Senate | 06/01/2020 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. | ||
House | 06/01/2020 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2020 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2020 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/29/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/29/2020 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2020 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2020 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |