House
|
06/15/2021
|
Effective date: 06/15/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 272.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 10 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/10/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Hewitt, Peterson, and Foil.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
House conferees appointed: Gadberry, Stefanski, and Mack.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|