House
|
06/17/2021
|
Effective date: 07/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 408.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 73, nays 19. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, Smith, and Bouie.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
House conferees appointed: Duplessis, James, and Magee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 2, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/09/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|