House
|
06/10/2021
|
Effective date: 08/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 122.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/02/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|