LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB151
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB151
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2021 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB151
Action History
House
05/10/2021
Becomes HB 705.
House
05/06/2021
Reported by substitute (8-0).
House
04/12/2021
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
House
03/19/2021
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
House
03/19/2021
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
House
03/19/2021
Prefiled.