House | 05/24/2021 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 59. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021. | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021. | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Prefiled. |