House
|
06/10/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/10/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Jackson, Cortez, and Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
House conferees appointed: White, Gregory Miller, and Schexnayder.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Reported with amendments (12-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|