House | 04/26/2021 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2021. | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2021. | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Reported with amendments (14-0). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. | ||
House | 03/23/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Prefiled. |