Senate | 04/21/2021 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2021. | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Prefiled. |