Louisiana 2021 2021 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB198 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 21RS-522	ORIGINAL
2021 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 198
BY REPRESENTATIVE PIERRE
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
MTR VEHICLE/LICEN PLATES:  Provides relative to Louisiana vehicle license plates
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:463(A)(3)(a) and (c), relative to Louisiana vehicle license
3 plates; to require the inclusion of the Louisiana tourism website on license plates;
4 and to provide for related matters.
5Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
6 Section 1.  R.S. 47:463(A)(3)(a) and (c) are hereby amended and reeancted to read
7as follows:
8 ยง463.  Private passenger vehicles; amputee veterans exempted; church, church
9	school, and religious order vehicles
10	A.
11	*          *          *
12	(3)(a)  The deputy secretary of the Department of Public Safety and
13 Corrections, public safety services, shall issue license plates for private passenger
14 vehicles.  After July 1, 1992 2021, there shall be issued one uniform identifiable
15 Louisiana license plate, the style of which shall be proposed by the department and
16 approved by the legislature on or before July 1, 1992 2021.  The Louisiana license
17 plate design shall include the Louisiana tourism website, with the word
18 "LouisianaTravel.com" imprinted on the license plate.  However, all special prestige
19 license plates issued in accordance with R.S. 47:463.6 et seq. shall contain the
20 uniform alpha-numeric series accompanied by a symbol or emblem representing the
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 21RS-522	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 198
1 organization requesting such plate, and, on and after January 1, 2019, the
2 international symbol of accessibility, upon request, if the applicant is eligible in
3 accordance with the provisions of R.S. 47:463.4.  All prestige license plates issued
4 after August 15, 1999, shall include a handling charge of three dollars and fifty cents
5 to offset the administrative costs of the department for the issuance of such plates.
6	*          *          *
7	(c)  The secretary of the Department of Public Safety and Corrections shall
8 issue one uniform identifiable license plate for privately owned personal trucks,
9 commonly referred to as pick-up trucks, which shall contain the phrase "Sportsman's
10 Paradise" imprinted on the bottom and shall contain the Louisiana tourism website,
11 "LouisianaTravel.com".  A plate shall be issued in accordance with the provisions
12 of this Subparagraph for all new registrations after January 1, 2004 2022.
13	*          *          *
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 198 Original 2021 Regular Session	Pierre
Abstract:  Requires the Louisiana license plate to include the Louisiana tourism website,
"LouisianaTravel.com".
Present law requires the deputy secretary of the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections
(DPS&C), public safety services, to issue one uniform identifiable La. license plate for
private passenger vehicles.  Present law requires the style of the license plate to be proposed
by the department and approved by the legislature on or before July 1, 1992.
Proposed law modifies present law by requiring the style to be proposed by the department
and approved by the legislature on or before July 1, 2021.
Present law requires all special prestige license plates contain the uniform alpha-numeric
series accompanied by a symbol or emblem representing the organization requesting the
plate and, if requested and eligible in accordance with present law, requires the international
symbol of accessability on or after Jan. 1, 2019.  Present law requires all prestige license
plates issued after Aug. 15, 1999 include a handling charge of $3.50 to offset the
administrative costs of the DPS&C for the issuance of such plates.
Proposed law retains present law and requires the La. license plate to include the La. tourism
website, LouisianaTravel.com.
Present law requires the secretary of the DPS&C to issue one uniform identifiable license
plate for privately owned personal trucks to contain the phrase "Sportsman's Paradise"
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 21RS-522	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 198
imprinted on the bottom.  Present law requires the license plate be issued in accordance with
present law for all new registrations after Jan. 1, 2004.
Proposed law retains present law and requires the La. tourism website, LouisianaTravel.com,
be contained on one uniform identifiable license plate for privately owned personal trucks.
Modifies the effective date for all new registrations to be in compliance with present law to
after Jan. 1, 2022.
(Amends R.S. 47:463(A)(3)(a) and (c))
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.