House | 04/29/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021. | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Reported with amendments (13-0-1). | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported with amendments (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Prefiled. |