Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|