House | 05/24/2021 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021. | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Reported favorably (15-5). | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Reported favorably (8-5). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Prefiled. |