House
|
06/11/2021
|
Effective date: 06/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 138.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/02/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|