Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|