House | 05/04/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021. | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Reported favorably (6-5). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 03/26/2021 | Prefiled. |