House | 05/26/2021 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021. | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021. | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Reported favorably (7-0). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Prefiled. |