Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Read by title. By a vote of 21 yeas and 16 nays, the bill failed to receive the required two-thirds vote. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Reported without action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 22. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 22. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported with amendments (11-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported favorably (12-4. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|