House | 05/10/2021 | Withdrawn from the files of the House. | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2021. | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Prefiled. |