House | 05/04/2021 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 49. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021. | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Reported with amendments (9-2). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Prefiled. |