House
|
06/22/2021
|
Effective date: 01/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 445.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|