House
|
06/16/2021
|
Effective date: 06/16/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 401.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 7. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: McMath, Allain, and Smith.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
House conferees appointed: Bourriaque, Bishop, and Magee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|