House | 05/06/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021. | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Becomes HB 703. | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Reported by substitute (9-0). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Prefiled. |