Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|