House | 05/17/2021 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 36, nays 50. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021. | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021. | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021. | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Reported with amendments (8-0). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Prefiled. |