House | 04/22/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2021. | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Reported with amendments (9-5). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Prefiled. |