Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|