House
|
05/20/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 49. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Reported favorably (6-4-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|