House
|
07/01/2021
|
Effective date: 08/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 486.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 88, nays 13. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
The House recommitted the bill to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Cathey, and Cortez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
House conferees appointed: Magee, Bishop, and Schexnayder.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 2, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|