House
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Allain, Hensgens, and Connick.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
House conferees appointed: Orgeron, Coussan, and Kerner.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 79, nays 12, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Reported favorably (10-4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|