Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported favorably (8-3-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|