House
|
06/29/2021
|
Effective date: 08/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 464.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 70, nays 27, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/10/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
By a vote of 70 yeas, 28 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 25. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|