Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 23. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported with amendments (13-2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Discharged from the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|