House
|
07/21/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2021
|
Veto message read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 10. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|