Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Reported with amendments (8-4-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|