Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 26. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|