House | 05/13/2021 | Becomes HB 709. | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Reported by substitute (5-4). | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Discharged from the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Prefiled. |