Senate | 05/17/2021 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021. | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Prefiled. |