House
|
05/18/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 36. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 39. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|