House | 05/11/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021. | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |