House
|
06/07/2021
|
Effective date: 07/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 117.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 10 for 5/27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 6 for 05/06/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported with amendments (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|