House
|
06/04/2021
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 80.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 628 reported by the Committee on Ways and Means (16-0).
|
|
|