House | 05/18/2021 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021. | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021. | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021. | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 524 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (7-5). |